Senate
|
06/05/2014
|
Effective date 6/5/2014.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2014
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 499.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2014
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2014
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2014
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2014
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2014
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2014
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2014
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/21/2014.
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2014
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2014
|
Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2014
|
Reported with amendments (11-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2014
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2014
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2014
|
Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2014
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2014
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2014
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2014
|
Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|