Senate
|
06/04/2014
|
Effective date 6/4/2014.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2014
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 476.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2014
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2014
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2014
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2014
|
Received from the House without amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2014
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 54, nays 28. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2014
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/22/2014.
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2014
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2014
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2014
|
Reported favorably (8-3). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2014
|
Received in the House from the Senate, rules suspended, read by title, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2014
|
The bill, as previously amended, was read by title, passed by a vote of 21 yeas and 17 nays, ordered reengrossed, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2014
|
Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2014
|
Reconsidered. Read by title; returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2014
|
Notice of reconsideration on the next legislative day.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2014
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title; failed to pass by a vote of 18 yeas and 17 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2014
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2014
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2014
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2014
|
Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|