House | 05/30/2014 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. | ||
House | 05/29/2014 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. | ||
Senate | 05/29/2014 | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | ||
Senate | 05/29/2014 | Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar. | ||
Senate | 05/21/2014 | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | ||
Senate | 05/20/2014 | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. | ||
Senate | 05/19/2014 | Reported with amendments. | ||
Senate | 04/02/2014 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education. | ||
Senate | 04/01/2014 | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |