House
|
05/29/2014
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/30/2014.
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2014
|
Read by title, amended, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2014
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2014
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2014
|
Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2014
|
Reported with amendments (15-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2014
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2014
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2014
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 32 yeas and 6 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2014
|
Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2014
|
The amended bill was read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2014
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2014
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2014
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2014
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2014
|
Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|