Senate | 04/30/2014 | Reconsidered. Read by title; returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | ||
Senate | 04/29/2014 | Notice of reconsideration on the next legislative day. | ||
Senate | 04/29/2014 | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title. By a vote of 20 yeas and 17 nays, the bill failed to receive the required two-thirds vote. | ||
Senate | 04/28/2014 | Read by title; Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered reengrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. | ||
Senate | 04/24/2014 | Reported with amendments. | ||
Senate | 04/07/2014 | Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance. | ||
Senate | 04/02/2014 | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. | ||
Senate | 04/01/2014 | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. | ||
Senate | 03/10/2014 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. | ||
Senate | 02/19/2014 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. |