Senate
|
05/22/2014
|
Effective date 8/1/2014.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2014
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 134.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2014
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2014
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2014
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2014
|
Received from the House without amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2014
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2014
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/13/2014.
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2014
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2014
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2014
|
Reported favorably (8-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2014
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2014
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2014
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2014
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2014
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2014
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2014
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
|
|
|