Senate | 05/05/2014 | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/2/2014. | ||
House | 04/28/2014 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
Senate | 04/28/2014 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | ||
Senate | 04/24/2014 | Received from the House without amendments. | ||
House | 04/24/2014 | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. | ||
House | 04/23/2014 | Received in the House from the Senate. | ||
Senate | 04/23/2014 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time by title and adopted by a vote of 28 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |