Senate | 05/30/2014 | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. | ||
House | 05/27/2014 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
Senate | 05/22/2014 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | ||
Senate | 05/21/2014 | Received from the House without amendments. | ||
House | 05/21/2014 | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. | ||
House | 05/20/2014 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. | ||
House | 05/20/2014 | Received in the House from the Senate. | ||
Senate | 05/20/2014 | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. | ||
Senate | 05/19/2014 | Reported favorably. | ||
Senate | 05/07/2014 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources. | ||
Senate | 05/06/2014 | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |