Senate | 05/22/2014 | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. | ||
House | 05/20/2014 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
Senate | 05/20/2014 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | ||
Senate | 05/19/2014 | Received from the House without amendments. | ||
House | 05/19/2014 | Read by title, concurred in by vote of 88 yeas, 0 nays. | ||
House | 05/15/2014 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/19/2014. | ||
House | 05/15/2014 | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/14/2014 | Reported favorably (17-0). | ||
House | 04/09/2014 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. | ||
House | 04/08/2014 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. | ||
House | 04/08/2014 | Received in the House from the Senate. | ||
Senate | 04/07/2014 | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. | ||
Senate | 04/02/2014 | Reported favorably. | ||
Senate | 03/10/2014 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |