Senate | 05/30/2014 | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. | ||
House | 05/29/2014 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
Senate | 05/29/2014 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | ||
Senate | 05/28/2014 | Received from the House without amendments. | ||
House | 05/27/2014 | Read by title, concurred in by vote of 90 yeas, 0 nays. | ||
House | 05/22/2014 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/27/2014. | ||
House | 05/21/2014 | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/20/2014 | Reported favorably (10-0). | ||
House | 05/15/2014 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. | ||
House | 05/14/2014 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. | ||
Senate | 05/14/2014 | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. | ||
Senate | 05/13/2014 | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. | ||
Senate | 05/12/2014 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. |