Senate
|
06/02/2014
|
Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/3/2014.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2014
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2014
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2014
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2014
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2014
|
Read by title, amended, concurred in by vote of 92 yeas, 0 nays.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2014
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/27/2014.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2014
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2014
|
Discharged from the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2014
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2014
|
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2014
|
Read by title and adopted by a vote of 29 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2014
|
Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|