Senate | 06/02/2014 | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | ||
Senate | 06/02/2014 | Rules suspended. | ||
Senate | 06/02/2014 | Received from the House with amendments. | ||
House | 06/02/2014 | Read by title, amended, concurred in by vote of 92 yeas, 3 nays. | ||
House | 05/30/2014 | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/02/2014. | ||
House | 05/29/2014 | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/28/2014 | Reported with amendments (10-0). | ||
House | 05/20/2014 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. | ||
House | 05/19/2014 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. | ||
House | 05/19/2014 | Received in the House from the Senate. | ||
Senate | 05/19/2014 | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 22 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. | ||
Senate | 05/15/2014 | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |