Senate | 04/03/2014 | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. | ||
House | 03/18/2014 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
Senate | 03/18/2014 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | ||
Senate | 03/17/2014 | Received from the House without amendments. | ||
House | 03/12/2014 | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. | ||
House | 03/12/2014 | Received in the House from the Senate. | ||
Senate | 03/12/2014 | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 29 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. | ||
Senate | 03/11/2014 | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |