Senate
|
05/30/2014
|
Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2014
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2014
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2014
|
Received from the House without amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2014
|
Read by title, concurred in by vote of 92 yeas, 0 nays.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2014
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/27/2014.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2014
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2014
|
Reported favorably (12-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2014
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2014
|
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2014
|
Received in the House from the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2014
|
Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and adopted by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2014
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2014
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2014
|
Rules suspended. Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2014
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|