House | 04/09/2014 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. | ||
House | 04/08/2014 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. | ||
House | 04/08/2014 | Received in the House from the Senate. | ||
Senate | 04/07/2014 | Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and adopted by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays; ordered engrossed and sent to the House. | ||
Senate | 04/02/2014 | Reported with amendments. | ||
Senate | 03/18/2014 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. | ||
Senate | 03/17/2014 | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |