Senate
|
05/19/2014
|
Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/15/2014.
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2014
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2014
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2014
|
Received from the House without amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2014
|
Read by title, concurred in by vote of 88 yeas, 0 nays.
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2014
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/07/2014.
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2014
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2014
|
Reported favorably (13-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2014
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works.
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2014
|
Received in the House from the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2014
|
Read by title and adopted by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2014
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2014
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2014
|
Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|