Senate | 04/03/2014 | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. | ||
House | 03/25/2014 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
Senate | 03/25/2014 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | ||
Senate | 03/24/2014 | Received from the House without amendments. | ||
House | 03/20/2014 | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. | ||
House | 03/19/2014 | Received in the House from the Senate. | ||
Senate | 03/19/2014 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time by title and adopted by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |