Senate
|
05/22/2014
|
Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2014
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2014
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2014
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2014
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2014
|
Read by title, amended, concurred in by vote of 88 yeas, 0 nays.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2014
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/19/2014.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2014
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2014
|
Reported favorably (6-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2014
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2014
|
Received in the House from the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2014
|
Read by title and adopted by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2014
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2014
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|