Senate
|
05/22/2014
|
Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2014
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2014
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2014
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 34 yeas and 3 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2014
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2014
|
Read by title, concurred in by vote of 86 yeas, 0 nays.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2014
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/19/2014.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2014
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2014
|
Reported with amendments (8-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2014
|
Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2014
|
Reported favorably (14-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2014
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2014
|
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2014
|
Received in the House from the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2014
|
Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and adopted by a vote of 32 yeas and 1 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2014
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2014
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2014
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2014
|
Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|