Senate
|
06/02/2014
|
Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/3/2014.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2014
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2014
|
Received from the House without amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2014
|
Read by title, concurred in by vote of 95 yeas, 0 nays.
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2014
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/30/2014.
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2014
|
Rules suspended, called from regular order.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2014
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2014
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2014
|
Reported favorably (12-0).
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2014
|
Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2014
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2014
|
Reported favorably (17-0), with the recommendation to recommit to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2014
|
Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2014
|
Discharged from the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2014
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2014
|
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2014
|
Received in the House from the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2014
|
Read by title and adopted by a vote of 38 yeas and 1 nays. Ordered sent to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2014
|
Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2014
|
Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Read by title; Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2014
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2014
|
Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|