Senate | 04/21/2014 | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 4/17/2014. | ||
House | 04/15/2014 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
Senate | 04/15/2014 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | ||
Senate | 04/14/2014 | Received from the House without amendments. | ||
House | 04/09/2014 | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. | ||
House | 04/08/2014 | Received in the House from the Senate. | ||
Senate | 04/08/2014 | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. | ||
Senate | 04/08/2014 | Called from the Calendar. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2014 | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | ||
Senate | 04/02/2014 | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |