Senate | 05/05/2014 | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/2/2014. | ||
House | 04/30/2014 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
Senate | 04/29/2014 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | ||
Senate | 04/28/2014 | Received from the House without amendments. | ||
House | 04/28/2014 | Read by title, concurred in. | ||
House | 04/24/2014 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. | ||
House | 04/24/2014 | Received in the House from the Senate. | ||
Senate | 04/24/2014 | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 31 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. | ||
Senate | 04/23/2014 | Reported favorably. | ||
Senate | 04/08/2014 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. | ||
Senate | 04/07/2014 | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |