Senate
|
05/22/2014
|
Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2014
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2014
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2014
|
Received from the House without amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2014
|
Read by title, concurred in by vote of 95 yeas, 0 nays.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2014
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/19/2014.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2014
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2014
|
Reported favorably (7-0).
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2014
|
Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2014
|
Reported favorably (12-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2014
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2014
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2014
|
Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and adopted by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays; ordered engrossed and sent to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2014
|
Rules suspended. Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2014
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2014
|
Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|