LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Louisiana LA
Legislatures
2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SCR78
Action History
LA
Louisiana Senate Bill SCR78
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Louisiana 2014 Regular Session
Louisiana Senate Bill SCR78
Action History
House
04/24/2014
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
House
04/23/2014
Received in the House from the Senate.
Senate
04/23/2014
Read by title and adopted by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House.
Senate
04/22/2014
Reported favorably.
Senate
04/15/2014
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
Senate
04/14/2014
Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.