Senate | 05/19/2014 | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/15/2014. | ||
House | 05/12/2014 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
Senate | 05/08/2014 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | ||
Senate | 05/07/2014 | Received from the House without amendments. | ||
House | 05/07/2014 | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. | ||
House | 05/07/2014 | Received in the House from the Senate. | ||
Senate | 05/07/2014 | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 29 yeas and nays. Ordered sent to the House. | ||
Senate | 05/07/2014 | Called from the Calendar. | ||
Senate | 03/11/2014 | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | ||
Senate | 03/10/2014 | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |