Senate | 05/22/2014 | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. | ||
House | 05/20/2014 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
Senate | 05/20/2014 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | ||
Senate | 05/19/2014 | Received from the House without amendments. | ||
House | 05/19/2014 | Read by title, concurred in by vote of 91 yeas, 0 nays. | ||
House | 05/15/2014 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/19/2014. | ||
House | 05/14/2014 | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/13/2014 | Reported favorably (13-0). | ||
House | 04/30/2014 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. | ||
House | 04/29/2014 | Received in the House from the Senate. | ||
Senate | 04/29/2014 | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. | ||
Senate | 04/28/2014 | Reported favorably. | ||
Senate | 04/15/2014 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education. | ||
Senate | 04/14/2014 | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |