LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Louisiana LA
Legislatures
2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SR13
Action History
LA
Louisiana Senate Bill SR13
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Louisiana 2014 Regular Session
Louisiana Senate Bill SR13
Action History
Senate
04/21/2014
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 4/17/2014.
Senate
04/15/2014
Read by title and adopted.
Senate
04/14/2014
Reported favorably.
Senate
03/17/2014
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
Senate
03/12/2014
Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.