Louisiana 2014 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SR203

Introduced
6/2/14  
Introduced
6/2/14  
Passed
6/2/14  

Caption

Requests the state Dept. of Education to study current procedures and practices for providing professional development to teachers.

Companion Bills

No companion bills found.

Similar Bills

LA SR15

Commends the Louisiana Society of Professional Surveyors and recognizes March 18, 2014, as "Louisiana Society of Professional Surveyors Day" at the State Capitol.

LA HB445

Provides relative to the Louisiana Licensed Professional Vocational Rehabilitation Counselors Board of Examiners

LA SR100

Recognizes May 5, 2016, as Louisiana Society of Professional Surveyors Day at the Louisiana State Capitol.

LA SR50

Recognizes April 27, 2017, as Louisiana Society of Professional Surveyors Day at the Louisiana State Capitol.

LA SCR100

Requests the Louisiana State Board of Examiners of Psychologists and the Louisiana Licensed Professional Counselors Board of Examiners to work in collaboration through the Mental Health Professional Working Group to meet certain goals and to report to the Senate and House committees on health and welfare by February 1, 2011.

LA SR26

Recognizes Tuesday, May 3, 2011, as Louisiana Society of Professional Surveyors Day at the Louisiana State Capitol.

LA HR205

Urges and requests the Louisiana Department of Health and the Louisiana Workforce Commission to organize a special committee to develop strategies for addressing the direct support professional workforce shortage

LA HCR36

Designates April 25, 2019, as Louisiana Society of Professional Surveyors Day at the Louisiana State Capitol