Louisiana 2014 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SR37

Introduced
3/31/14  
Introduced
3/31/14  
Passed
4/1/14  

Caption

Commends the service and contributions of The Links, Incorporated and recognizes Wednesday, April 23, 2014, as Louisiana Links Day at the State Capitol.

Companion Bills

No companion bills found.

Previously Filed As

LA SR79

Commends the service and contributions of the Links, Incorporated and recognizes Wednesday, June 8, 2011, as Louisiana Links Day at the State Capitol.

LA SR77

Commends the service and contributions of The Links, Incorporated and recognizes Wednesday, May 12, 2010, as Louisiana Links Day at the State Capitol.

LA SR90

Commends the service and contributions of The Links, Incorporated and recognizes Wednesday, May 15, 2013, as Louisiana Links Day at the State Capitol.

LA SR70

Commends the service and contributions of The Links, Incorporated and recognizes Wednesday, May 6, 2015, as Louisiana Links Day at the State Capitol.

Similar Bills

No similar bills found.