LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Louisiana LA
Legislatures
2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SSR2
Action History
LA
Louisiana Senate Bill SSR2
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Louisiana 2014 Regular Session
Louisiana Senate Bill SSR2
Action History
Senate
05/20/2014
Approved on 5/20/2014.
Senate
05/14/2014
Study request list distributed to the members on 5/14/2014.
Senate
05/13/2014
Request study by the committee on Environmental Quality.
Senate
05/13/2014
Received by the Senate Office on 5/13/2014.