LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Louisiana LA
Legislatures
2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SSR5
Action History
LA
Louisiana Senate Bill SSR5
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Louisiana 2014 Regular Session
Louisiana Senate Bill SSR5
Action History
Senate
06/02/2014
Approved on 6/2/2014.
Senate
05/29/2014
Study request list distributed to the members on 5/29/2014.
Senate
05/28/2014
Request study by the committee on Judiciary A.
Senate
05/28/2014
Received by the Senate Office on 5/28/2014.