Senate
|
06/05/2015
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2015
|
Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2015
|
Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 100, nays 1. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/26/2015.
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Reported favorably (13-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2015
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2015
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/20/2015.
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2015
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2015
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|