House | 05/06/2015 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 05/04/2015 | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/06/2015. | ||
House | 04/30/2015 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 04/29/2015 | Reported with amendments (12-1-1). | ||
House | 04/13/2015 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Insurance. | ||
House | 03/27/2015 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/27/2015. | ||
House | 03/25/2015 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Insurance. | ||
House | 03/25/2015 | Prefiled. |