House | 05/20/2015 | Notice removed | ||
House | 05/14/2015 | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/20/2015. | ||
House | 05/14/2015 | Notice given. | ||
House | 04/28/2015 | Read by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules. | ||
House | 04/27/2015 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 53, nays 40. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass. Motion to reconsider pending. | ||
House | 04/22/2015 | Scheduled for floor debate on 4/27/2015. | ||
House | 04/22/2015 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 04/21/2015 | Reported favorably (13-4). | ||
House | 04/13/2015 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. | ||
House | 03/27/2015 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/27/2015. | ||
House | 03/25/2015 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. | ||
House | 03/25/2015 | Prefiled. |