Senate | 05/18/2015 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. | ||
Senate | 05/14/2015 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | ||
House | 05/13/2015 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 99, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 05/07/2015 | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/13/2015. | ||
House | 05/07/2015 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/06/2015 | Reported with amendments (9-0). | ||
House | 04/13/2015 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | ||
House | 03/27/2015 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/27/2015. | ||
House | 03/26/2015 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | ||
House | 03/26/2015 | Prefiled. |