Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 76, nays 15. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/13/2015.
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Read by title, amended, ordered reengrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Reported with amendments (8-0-1).
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Reported with amendments (8-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2015
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2015
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2015
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|