House
|
06/11/2015
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2015
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Nevers, Ward, and Adley.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2015
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2015
|
Notice House rejected the Senate amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/11/2015
|
House conferees appointed: Schexnayder, Abramson, and Berthelot.
|
|
|
House
|
06/11/2015
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 94, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
|
|
|
House
|
06/11/2015
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
06/11/2015
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2015
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/08/2015.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2015
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2015
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/04/2015.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 92, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/13/2015.
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Reported with amendments (10-0-1).
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2015
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2015
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2015
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|