Senate | 05/25/2015 | Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. | ||
Senate | 05/25/2015 | Rules suspended. | ||
Senate | 05/07/2015 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. | ||
Senate | 05/06/2015 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | ||
House | 05/05/2015 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 99, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 05/04/2015 | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/05/2015. | ||
House | 04/29/2015 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 04/28/2015 | Reported with amendments (16-0). | ||
House | 04/13/2015 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. | ||
House | 03/30/2015 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. | ||
House | 03/30/2015 | Prefiled. |