Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2015
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Insurance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2015
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2015
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 4/27/2015.
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2015
|
Reported favorably (11-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2015
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Insurance.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2015
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Insurance.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2015
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|