Louisiana 2015 2015 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HB223 Comm Sub / Analysis

                    RÉSUMÉ DIGEST
ACT 381 (HB 223) 2015 Regular Session	Hodges
Prior law (Sunset) provided that the Governor's Office of Homeland Security and Emergency
Preparedness (GOHSEP) and all the statutory entities made a part of that department by law
would begin to terminate their operations on July 1, 2014, and that all legislative authority
for such entities would cease as of July 1, 2015, unless the legislature enacted a bill
authorizing the re-creation of the department and its statutory entities prior thereto.
New law provides for the general re-creation of GOHSEP and its statutory entities, effective
June 30, 2015, in accordance with the "sunset law".  New law supersedes the provisions of
the "sunset law" which set out the procedure for review and re-creation and which require
a separate bill to re-create each statutory entity with the department along with additional
provisions, including ratification and authorization of any acts taken by GOHSEP on or after
June 30, 2014, through June 30, 2015.
New law makes July 1, 2019, the new termination date and provides that termination will
begin July 1, 2018, unless the department is re-created again.
Effective June 30, 2015.
(Adds R.S. 49:191(8)(m) and (9); Repeals R.S. 49:191(5)(k) and (10))