Louisiana 2015 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HB223 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version

                            ENROLLED
ACT No. 381
2015 Regular Session
HOUSE BILL NO. 223
BY REPRESENTATIVE HODGES
1	AN ACT
2 To enact R.S. 49:191(8)(m) and (9) and to repeal R.S. 49:191(5)(k) and (10), relative to the
3 Governor's Office of Homeland Security and Emergency Preparedness, including
4 provisions to provide for the re-creation of the Governor's Office of Homeland
5 Security and Emergency Preparedness and the statutory entities made a part of the
6 department by law; to provide for the effective termination date for all statutory
7 authority for the existence of such statutory entities; to provide for prospective and
8 retroactive application; and to provide for related matters.
9 Be it enacted by the Legislature of Louisiana:
10 Section 1.  Pursuant to R.S. 49:193, the Governor's Office of Homeland Security and
11 Emergency Preparedness and the statutory entities made a part of the department by law
12 shall be re-created effective June 30, 2015, and all statutory authority therefor is continued
13 in accordance with the provisions of Part XII of Chapter 1 of Title 49 of the Louisiana
14 Revised Statutes of 1950.
15 Section 2.  All acts, on or after June 30, 2014, to the effective date of this Act, made
16 pursuant to law, including but not limited to the provisions of Chapter 6 of Title 29 of the
17 Louisiana Revised Statutes of 1950, by the Governor's Office of Homeland Security and
18 Emergency Preparedness and the statutory entities which are a part thereof, which, except
19 for the effect of the provisions of Part XII of Chapter 1 of Title 49 of the Louisiana Revised
20 Statutes of 1950 are otherwise legal, and are hereby ratified, authorized, and made valid.
Page 1 of 3
CODING:  Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored
are additions. HB NO. 223	ENROLLED
1 Section 3.  All statutory authority for the existence of the Governor's Office of
2 Homeland Security and Emergency Preparedness and the statutory entities made a part of
3 the department as re-created by Section 1 of this Act shall cease as of July 1, 2019, pursuant
4 to R.S. 49:191.  However, the Governor's Office of Homeland Security and Emergency
5 Preparedness may be re-created prior to such date in accordance with the provisions of Part
6 XII of Chapter 1 of Title 49 of the Louisiana Revised Statutes of 1950.
7 Section 4.  The provisions of R.S. 49:193 are hereby superseded to the extent that
8 those provisions are in conflict with the provisions of this Act.
9 Section 5.  R.S. 49:191(8)(m) and (9) are hereby enacted to read as follows:
10 ยง191.  Termination of legislative authority for existence of statutory entities; phase-
11	out period for statutory entities; table of dates
12	Notwithstanding any termination dates set by any previous Act of the
13 legislature, the statutory entities set forth in this Section shall begin to terminate their
14 operations on July first of each of the following years, and all legislative authority
15 for the existence of any statutory entity, as defined in R.S. 49:190, shall cease as of
16 July first of the following year, which shall be the termination date:
17	*          *          *
18	(8)  July 1, 2018:
19	*          *          *
20	(m)  The Governor's Office of Homeland Security and Emergency
21 Preparedness and all statutory entities made a part of the department by law.
22	(10)  (9) July 1, 2020:
23	(a)  The Department of Public Safety and Corrections and all statutory
24 entities made a part of the department by law.
25	*          *          *
26 Section 6.  R.S. 49:191(5)(k) and (10) are hereby repealed in its entirety.
27 Section 7.  This Act shall become effective on June 30, 2015; if vetoed by the
28 governor and subsequently approved by the legislature, this Act shall become effective on
29 June 30, 2015, or on the day following such approval by the legislature, whichever is later.
Page 2 of 3
CODING:  Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored
are additions. HB NO. 223	ENROLLED
1 Section 8. The provisions of this Act shall be given prospective and retroactive
2 application.
SPEAKER OF THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES
PRESIDENT OF THE SENATE
GOVERNOR OF THE STATE OF LOUISIANA
APPROVED:  
Page 3 of 3
CODING:  Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored
are additions.