Senate
|
06/03/2015
|
Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2015
|
Rules suspended. Recalled from Committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2015
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 79, nays 15. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2015
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/02/2015.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2015
|
Read by title, amended, ordered reengrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2015
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2015
|
Reported with amendments (10-0-1).
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Reported favorably (14-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2015
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2015
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2015
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|