House
|
06/19/2015
|
Effective date: July 1, 2015.
|
|
|
House
|
06/19/2015
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 105.
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2015
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2015
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2015
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2015
|
Received from the Senate without amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2015
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 3 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2015
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
Rules suspended. Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 91, nays 6. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/26/2015.
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Reported with amendments (13-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2015
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2015
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2015
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|