House
|
06/19/2015
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2015
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/11/2015
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2015
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2015
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 65, nays 29, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2015
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 6/09/2015.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2015
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2015
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2015
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2015
|
Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2015
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 92, nays 2. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2015
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/01/2015.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/12/2015.
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Reported with amendments (16-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2015
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2015
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2015
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|