House | 05/20/2015 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 05/14/2015 | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/20/2015. | ||
House | 05/14/2015 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/13/2015 | Reported favorably (11-0). | ||
House | 04/13/2015 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. | ||
House | 04/01/2015 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. | ||
House | 04/01/2015 | Prefiled. |