House
|
06/19/2015
|
Effective date: June 19, 2015.
|
|
|
House
|
06/19/2015
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 36.
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2015
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2015
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2015
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2015
|
Received from the Senate without amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2015
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2015
|
Read by title; made Special Order of the Day No. 3 for 6/8/15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2015
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
Rules suspended. Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Made Special Order of the day No. 2 for 5/28/2015.
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Reported favorably (16-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Read by title.
|
|
|