House | 05/19/2015 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 05/14/2015 | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/19/2015. | ||
House | 05/11/2015 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/07/2015 | Reported with amendments (11-6). | ||
House | 04/13/2015 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. | ||
House | 04/01/2015 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. | ||
House | 04/01/2015 | Prefiled. |