House
|
05/28/2015
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 68, nays 23. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/28/2015.
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Read by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules.
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 66, nays 25. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass. Motion to reconsider pending.
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 4/22/2015.
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Reported favorably (15-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2015
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce.
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2015
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce.
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2015
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|