House
|
06/29/2015
|
Effective date: August 1, 2015.
|
|
|
House
|
06/29/2015
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 319.
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2015
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2015
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2015
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2015
|
Received from the Senate without amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2015
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 32 yeas and 4 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2015
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2015
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2015
|
Rules suspended. Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 71, nays 24. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/26/2015.
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Read by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules.
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 67, nays 29. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass. Motion to reconsider pending.
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/19/2015.
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 4/22/2015.
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Reported favorably (15-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2015
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce.
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2015
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce.
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2015
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|