House | 05/12/2015 | Notice removed | ||
House | 05/07/2015 | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/12/2015. | ||
House | 05/07/2015 | Notice given. | ||
House | 05/06/2015 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 05/04/2015 | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/06/2015. | ||
House | 04/30/2015 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 04/29/2015 | Reported favorably (9-1). | ||
House | 04/13/2015 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. | ||
House | 04/02/2015 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education. | ||
House | 04/02/2015 | Prefiled. |